Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Białasik Wawrowska, S.V.D.

Bishop of Oruro, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1958 Born
8 Sep 198022.1ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
15 Jun 198526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
30 Jun 200546.9AppointedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
17 Sep 200547.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oruro, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Białasik Wawrowska
Bishop Krzysztof Białasik Wawrowska S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Oruro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZbaszyn, Poland
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Asunción, Cathedral, Oruro, Diocese of Oruro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oruro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,975

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018