Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Bürgler, C.SS.R.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Sinnipsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1943 Born
18 May 197329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Jan 199753.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
24 Jan 199753.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
11 Apr 199753.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
1 May 199955.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
18 Feb 201975.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Bürgler
Bishop Carlos Bürgler C.SS.R. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIllgau, Switzerland
Ordained BishopLos Santos Reyes, Cathedral, Reyes, Vicariate Apostolic of Reyes

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Reyes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,991
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast