Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waldo Rubén Barrionuevo Ramírez, C.SS.R.

Vicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1967 Born
2 Feb 199224.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Mar 199628.5Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Oct 199730.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Feb 201446.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reyes, Bolivia
15 Feb 201446.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
14 May 201446.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
18 Feb 201951.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Reyes, Bolivia
1 Jun 201951.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
10 Jul 201951.8InstalledVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Waldo Rubén Barrionuevo Ramírez
Bishop Waldo Rubén Barrionuevo Ramírez C.SS.R. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Reyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOruro
Ordained Bishoplos Santos Reyes, Cathedral, Reyes, Vicariate Apostolic of Reyes

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Reyes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 5 Apr 2014
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,159
  • aadm: CB, 19 Feb 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2019
  • i: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast