Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sánchez Matas, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1762BornRobledo, Spain
21 Dec 181856.2AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1 Oct 182058.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
28 Apr 182764.5ResignedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
184986.2DiedBishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sánchez Matas
Bishop Antonio Sánchez Matas O.F.M. Obs. (born , died 1849) Bishop Emeritus of La Paz

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 295
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 139, Number 753
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016