Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Dios Bosque

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1829Born
22 Apr 185425.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Paz, Bolivia
23 Apr 185425.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
3 Jul 187344.3SelectedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
4 May 187445.1ConfirmedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
13 Sep 187445.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
9 May 189061.1DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Juan de Dios Bosque (VIAF: 285615734)
Bishop Juan de Dios Bosque (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorata d'Esquival, Diocese of La Paz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Charcas, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 434
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017