Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Mendoza Jara

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1777BornCusco
1803²25.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cuzco, Peru
9 Jun 183658.6SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
17 Sep 183860.8ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
4 Aug 184466.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1 Aug 184567.7InstalledBishop of Cuzco, Peru
18 Aug 185476.8DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Mendoza Jara:
Bishop Eugenio Mendoza Jara (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 170
  • op/c1: LB, 31 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013