Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Jose Puch y Solona

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1813Born
1 Dec 183522.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Mar 183623.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 186148.8AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
24 Aug 186249.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
25 Nov 188572.8DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Jose Puch y Solona
Archbishop Pedro Jose Puch y Solona (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharcas, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Ordained BishopN.D. de la Merci, La Paz, Diocese of La Paz

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 459
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017