Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Baldivia Morales

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1831BornLa Paz
1854¹22.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 187847.3AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
2 Mar 187947.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1 Jun 189160.2AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
5 Oct 189968.5DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Baldivia Morales:
Bishop Juan José Baldivia Morales (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 232, and Page 434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013