Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro José Cayetano de la Llosa, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1829Born
10 Jul 185222.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Jul 185222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Nov 188758.2AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
20 May 188858.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
2 Aug 189767.9DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Cayetano de la Llosa
Archbishop Pedro José Cayetano de la Llosa C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSucre, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Ordained BishopSucre, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 459
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017