Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Mendizábal López de Velasco

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1778BornJujuy
15 Dec 182850.3AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
30 Nov 182951.2Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Jul 183556.9AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
29 Sep 184668.1DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José María Mendizábal López de Velasco
Archbishop José María Mendizábal López de Velasco (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 295, and Page 310
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016