Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustin Fernández de Córdoba

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1775BornChuquisaca, Bolivia
1798²22.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 183963.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
1841²65.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
1845²69.3DiedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustin Fernández de Córdoba
Bishop Agustin Fernández de Córdoba (born , died 1845) Titular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 94
  • b: LB, 6 Jun 2013
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Oct 2016