Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Fernández de Córdoba y Meló

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1774BornChuquisaca
28 Oct 179723.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Mar 179823.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 183561.3AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
14 Aug 183662.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
13 Jul 184066.3AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
4 Mar 184166.9DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Fernández de Córdoba y Meló:
Bishop José Manuel Fernández de Córdoba y Meló (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 168, and Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013