Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Bernardo (Andrew Bernard) Schierhoff

Deceased

Prelate of Pando, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Pumentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1922Born
14 Apr 194826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
11 Nov 196846.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
11 Nov 196846.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pumentum
6 Jan 196946.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pumentum
17 Dec 198260.8AppointedPrelate of Pando, Bolivia
1 Dec 198664.8DiedPrelate of Pando, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Andrés Bernardo (Andrew Bernard) Schierhoff
Bishop Andrés Bernardo (Andrew Bernard) Schierhoff (born , died ) Prelate of Pando

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt.Louis, MO, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
Ordained PriestSt.Louis, MO, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast