Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Manrique Hurtado

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1911BornLa Paz
23 Sep 193928.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
23 Feb 195240.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
23 Feb 195240.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
4 May 195241.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
28 Jul 195645.3AppointedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
27 Jul 196756.3AppointedArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Feb 198775.8RetiredArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
15 Jul 199584.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Manrique Hurtado:
Archbishop Jorge Manrique Hurtado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013