Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold Bühl, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oruro

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1885BornErlenbach, Germany
16 Jun 190923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jan 193145.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chiquitos, Bolivia
3 Jan 193145.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
1 Mar 193145.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae
21 Nov 194257.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cochabamba, Bolivia
26 Oct 195166.1AppointedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
17 Jun 195367.7ResignedBishop of Oruro, Bolivia
17 Jun 195367.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
19 Apr 196882.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Oruro, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Berthold Bühl:
Bishop Berthold Bühl O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oruro

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013