Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cleto Loayza Gumiel

Deceased

Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1888Born
3 Mar 191122.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 192436.5AppointedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
15 Mar 192536.8Ordained BishopBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
30 Dec 196880.6DiedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Cleto Loayza Gumiel
Bishop Cleto Loayza Gumiel (born , died ) Bishop of Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSucre

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018