Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Leonardo Fey Schneider, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Potosí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1910BornPetite Rosselle, France
8 Sep 192919.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Aug 193525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 Jul 195242.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia
9 Jul 195242.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia Minor
7 Sep 195242.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia Minor
28 Jul 195646.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia
30 Dec 196858.8SucceededBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
21 May 198373.2ResignedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
20 Oct 198979.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Potosí, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Leonardo Fey Schneider:
Bishop Bernardo Leonardo Fey Schneider C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Potosí

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013