Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Rivera Alvarez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Potosí

Titular Bishop of Mutugenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1925BornPanacachi
20 Dec 195227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Nov 197651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia
22 Nov 197651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
16 Jan 197752.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
25 Apr 200075.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia
12 Jul 201085.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Potosí, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Rivera Alvarez:
Bishop Bernardino Rivera Alvarez O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Potosí

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013