Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Niccolai, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarija


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1898BornChiazzano, Italy
13 Aug 192224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Feb 194445.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarija, Bolivia
20 Feb 194445.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhandus
28 May 194446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhandus
16 Aug 194749.4SucceededBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
11 Dec 197476.7RetiredBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
18 Aug 197678.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarija, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Juan Niccolai:
Bishop Juan Niccolai O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarija

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013