Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesar Francesco Benedetti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cuevo

Titular Bishop of Tiddi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1898BornVinacciano
13 Aug 192224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Feb 195153.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cuevo, Bolivia
8 Feb 195153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiddi
22 Apr 195153.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiddi
18 Dec 197274.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Cuevo, Bolivia
4 Apr 198385.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cuevo, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Cesar Francesco Benedetti:
Bishop Cesar Francesco Benedetti O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cuevo

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013