Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri

Apostolicus Vicariatus Cuevensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 29 March 2003
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 104,000 (40,170 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Misión Católica, Calle Méndez Arco s/n, Casilla 36, Camiri, Bolivia
  • Telephone: (03)9522.970
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Chaco
22 May 1919ErectedDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Vicariate Apostolic of Chaco (erected)
12 February 1925Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Chaco Prefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Cuevo
8 February 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Chaco Vicariate Apostolic of Cuevo
Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri
29 March 2003Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cuevo Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Chaco
195026,96514141,9261020ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Cuevo
196664,00068,00094.1%19193,36892918ap1967
197065,00069,00094.2%20203,250222818ap1971
197675,00085,00088.2%123243,1251323220ap1977
198076,00080,00095.0%23233,304323820ap1981
199088,00097,00090.7%120214,190254520ap1991
1999108,750120,15090.5%114157,2501225122ap2000
2000101,600120,40084.4%214166,3501205323ap2001
2001108,000123,30087.6%415195,6841214723ap2002
2002105,400120,00087.8%515205,2701195423ap2003
Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri
2003113,800132,90085.6%712195,9892165423ap2004
2004110,500129,00085.7%712195,8153165723ap2005
2010120,000144,00083.3%1313264,6151175024ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013