Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Sieffert, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Paz

Titular Bishop of Polybotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1873BornIrmstett, France
15 Oct 189219.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Aug 189724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Nov 192451.2AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
15 Mar 192551.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Feb 193460.5ResignedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Feb 193460.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Polybotus
6 Apr 195177.6DiedBishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Auguste Sieffert:
Bishop Auguste Sieffert C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Paz

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1925, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015