Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Urbán de Mota y Haro

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹BornIoco Ica, Peru
12 May 170257.3AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
30 Dec 170358.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
25 Dec 170459.9DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Urbán de Mota y Haro:
Bishop Nicolás Urbán de Mota y Haro (born 1645, died ) Bishop of La Paz

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,859
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 44
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015