Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Maria Casullo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cândido Mendes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1909BornMonteleone di Puglia, Italy
16 Jul 193223.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 195142.0AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
15 Jul 195142.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
11 Feb 196353.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pinheiro, Maranho, Brazil
11 Feb 196353.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
20 Dec 196556.6AppointedPrelate of Cândido Mendes, Maranho, Brazil
26 May 197869.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Utica
13 Oct 198374.4AppointedBishop of Cândido Mendes, Brazil
5 Nov 198576.4RetiredBishop of Cândido Mendes, Brazil
10 Jan 200494.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Cândido Mendes, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Guido Maria Casullo:
Bishop Guido Maria Casullo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cândido Mendes

  • a priest for 71.5 years
  • a bishop for 52.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013