Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Zerrillo

Bishop Emeritus of Lucera-Troia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1931 BornReino
25 Jul 195423.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 198554.6AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
25 Jan 198654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
15 Feb 199765.8AppointedBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
5 Apr 199766.0InstalledBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
30 Jun 200776.2RetiredBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Zerrillo:
Bishop Francesco Zerrillo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucera-Troia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lucera-Troia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,233
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013