Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Cornacchia

Bishop of Lucera-Troia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1950 BornAltamura
24 Apr 197626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
30 Jun 200757.4AppointedBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
22 Sep 200757.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
14 Oct 200757.7InstalledBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Cornacchia:
Bishop Domenico Cornacchia (born ) Bishop of Lucera-Troia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lucera-Troia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013