Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Baldassarri

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna e Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1907BornFaenza
11 Aug 192922.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 195649.3AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy
29 Jun 195649.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy
29 Nov 197568.9ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy
3 Sep 198275.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Baldassarri:
Archbishop Salvatore Baldassarri (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna e Cervia

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015