Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Proni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1912BornLugo
27 Jun 193724.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 196249.6AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
27 May 196249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
10 Mar 197057.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Forli, Italy
10 Mar 197057.5AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
9 Jun 197663.8SucceededBishop of Forli, Italy
30 Sep 198674.1AppointedBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
9 Apr 198875.6RetiredBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
15 Nov 199179.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Proni:
Bishop Giovanni Proni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013