Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adriano Bernareggi

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1884BornOreno
21 Jul 190722.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193147.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
16 Dec 193147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
24 Jan 193247.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
14 Apr 193651.4SucceededBishop of Bergamo, Italy
28 Jan 195368.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Bergamo, Italy
23 Jun 195368.6DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adriano Bernareggi:
Archbishop Adriano Bernareggi (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013