Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Jeremiah Pesce, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Dodoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1908Born
24 Sep 193224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
10 May 195142.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dodoma, Tanzania
10 May 195142.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
15 Jul 195142.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
25 Mar 195344.6AppointedBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
20 Dec 197163.3DiedBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Anthony Jeremiah Pesce
Bishop Anthony Jeremiah Pesce C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Dodoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocche di Molare, Italy

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018