Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Mozzanica, Ob. S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Sela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1873BornOlgiate Molgora
20 Sep 189623.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 193461.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1 Dec 193461.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sela
23 Dec 193461.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sela
16 Jul 193663.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Mozzanica:
Bishop Pietro Mozzanica Ob. S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013