Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Girardi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1880Born
1903²22.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 193453.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
18 Jun 193453.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
17 Apr 194261.7DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Girardi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Girardi (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,934, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast