Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice del Sordo

Deceased

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1850BornNusco
20 Dec 187323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nusco, Italy
9 Nov 190656.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nusco, Italy
9 Nov 190656.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
8 Dec 190656.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
12 Aug 190757.5AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
12 Oct 191161.7AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
7 Jul 192878.4DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice del Sordo:
Bishop Felice del Sordo (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 47
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1906, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013