Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aluigi Cossio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Recanati, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Sebastopolis in Abasgia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1874Born
29 Jul 189723.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 192349.5AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
25 Mar 192449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
31 Aug 192450.2InstalledBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
12 Aug 195581.2RetiredBishop of Recanati, Italy
12 Aug 195581.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastopolis in Abasgia
3 Jan 195681.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Recanati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aluigi Cossio
Archbishop Aluigi Cossio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Recanati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCividale del Friuli

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018