Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Valerii

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1895Born
18 Mar 192125.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 194549.6AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
28 Oct 194549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
10 Nov 197377.9RetiredBishop of Marsi, Italy
23 Dec 197984.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Valerii
Bishop Domenico Valerii (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpiano

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018