Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Binni

Deceased

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1902Born
15 Jul 192623.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 195249.4AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
19 Mar 195249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
7 Jan 197168.3DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Binni
Bishop Adolfo Binni (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonsampolo del Tronto

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 May 2020

Quantcast