Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio Squintani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1885Born
10 Aug 190722.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 193651.5AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
1 Nov 193651.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
17 Dec 195671.8ResignedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
17 Dec 195671.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
8 Aug 196075.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Squintani
Archbishop Ambrogio Squintani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlacePizzighettone

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017