Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Franco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1877Born
29 Jun 190022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Asti, Italy
10 Mar 191941.6AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
1 May 191941.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy
18 Sep 193356.1AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
10 Jul 195072.9RetiredBishop of Crema, Italy
10 Jul 195072.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ilium
7 Feb 196890.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Franco
Bishop Francesco Maria Franco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Damiano d’Asti

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast