Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Rota

Deceased

Bishop of Fidenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1886Born
21 May 191023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
10 Mar 194760.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cremona, Italy
10 Mar 194760.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
25 May 194760.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
28 Dec 195266.2AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
31 Dec 196074.2DiedBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Rota
Bishop Paolo Rota (born , died ) Bishop of Fidenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalsigone

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017