Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Vacchiano

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1914Born
1 Aug 193722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nola, Italy
17 Jan 197055.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1 Mar 197055.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
30 Mar 197863.5AppointedPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
14 Nov 198773.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
13 Oct 199076.1RetiredPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
24 May 200186.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Vacchiano
Archbishop Domenico Vacchiano (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCicciano

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018