Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Saverio Toppi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1925BornBrusciano
29 Jun 194823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Oct 199065.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
7 Dec 199065.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
17 Feb 200175.6RetiredPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
2 Apr 200781.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Toppi:
Archbishop Francesco Saverio Toppi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,387
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013