Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Franceschini

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1844Born
21 Dec 186722.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189247.5AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
17 Jul 189247.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
22 Jun 189651.4AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
29 Mar 191671.2DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Franceschini (VIAF: 88722444)
Bishop Vincenzo Franceschini (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottammare, Diocese of Ripatransone
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 268, and Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017