Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Martucci

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1825Born
8 Mar 184520.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187449.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
21 Dec 187449.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
27 Dec 187449.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
23 Dec 188055.8SucceededBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
16 Dec 188964.8DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Martucci
Bishop Luigi Martucci (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Marano
Ordained BishopTrinite des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 446, and Page 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017