Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zaccaria Fanciulli, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

Titular Bishop of Maronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1812Born
21 Nov 187159.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
21 Nov 187159.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
18 Feb 187259.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
4 Nov 187361.5DiedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Zaccaria Fanciulli
Bishop Zaccaria Fanciulli O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatignano, Diocese of Penne e Atri, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Sepulcre, Jerusalem, Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 368
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017