Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Vincenzo Bracco

Deceased

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1835Born
18 Jun 185924.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 186630.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
2 Mar 186630.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
13 May 186631.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
21 Mar 187338.0AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
19 Jun 188954.2DiedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bracco (VIAF: 282078626)
Patriarch Vincenzo Bracco (born , died ) Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrazzo, Diocese of Albenga, Italy
Ordained BishopSt Sepulcre, Jerusalem, Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 306, and Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017