Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orazio Montani (Montano)

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1591AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
25 Nov 1598AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
11 Sep 1603DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Orazio Montani (Montano)
Archbishop Orazio Montani (Montano) (died ) Archbishop of Arles

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolicastro
Death PlaceSalon de Provence, Bouches du Rhone

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271, and Page 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,591, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast