Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Piras

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1865Born
6 Dec 190641.1AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
20 Jan 190741.2Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
23 Aug 191145.8DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Piras
Bishop Raffaele Piras (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuartuccio

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018