Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raimondo Ingheo-Ledda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1821Born
8 Apr 184827.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 188463.6AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
8 Dec 188463.7Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
16 Dec 190786.7ResignedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
16 Dec 190786.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
8 Jul 191190.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Ingheo-Ledda (VIAF: 89768228)
Archbishop Raimondo Ingheo-Ledda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanluri, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopSt. Anne, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 255
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017