Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Depau-Puddu

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1831Born
27 Jan 185624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ogliastra, Italy
12 Jun 189361.9AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
24 Mar 189563.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
12 Dec 189968.4DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Depau-Puddu
Bishop Salvatore Depau-Puddu (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUlassai, Diocese of Ogliastra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1895, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017