Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Contini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1839Born
19 Dec 186324.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 188242.8AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
17 Dec 188243.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
16 Jan 189353.1AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
1907¹67.1ResignedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
23 Aug 191474.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Contini (VIAF: 88747160)
Bishop Antonio Maria Contini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScano-Montiferro, Diocese of Bosa
Ordained BishopBosa, Diocese of Bosa

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 97, and Page 423
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017